THAMES REACH CHARITY

Charity number: 1166311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE TULLOCH Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Elizabeth Chapman-Clowes Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record
DAVID ASHLEY JOHN FORD Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
PETER JAMES DAVEY Trustee 01 April 1988
EDWARD CARPENTER COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
STEPHEN HOWARD Chair 01 November 2016
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL CHURCH Recently registered
TONY MCBREARTY Trustee 01 April 1986 None on record
Rebecca Louise Taber Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Georgina Thompson Trustee 08 February 2021 None on record
MICHAEL SCORER Trustee 01 April 2011 None on record
WILLIAM FLENLEY Trustee 01 April 2001 None on record
JOANNA WADE Trustee 01 April 1996 None on record
VASIM UL HAQ Trustee 01 April 2001
THAMES REACH HOUSING Recently registered