BIDBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL - CIO

Charity number: 1166337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 30/06/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £28.54k £37.41k £31.09k £32.58k £22.90k
Total expenditure £41.43k £31.06k £21.20k £36.38k £13.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k N/A £10.00k £8.00k