FLAIR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168868
Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 222 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 222 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 August 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 26 August 2020 118 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download