Accounts and annual returns SKYANGELS AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1168225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 23 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2020 13 April 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 13 April 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2019 01 April 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 01 April 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window