ASSOCIATION FOR PSYCHOSOCIAL STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote psychosocial thinking in order to better understand and intervene in contemporary problems. To this end we hold bi-annual conferences that are open to the public; we organise and promote lectures, workshops and seminars that are open to the public. Many are free of charge. In addition we are responsible for the production of The Journal of Psychosocial Studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2016: Standard registration
- APS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacob Johanssen | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Candida Yates | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Scanlon | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID Wyn Jones PHD | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FROST | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LYNN FROGGETT PHD | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £5.48k | £6.06k | £3.81k | £8.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £6.74k | £6.73k | £5.30k | £6.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FIELD OF PSYCHOSOCIAL STUDIES AND TO PUBLISH RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PSYCHOSOCIAL STUDIES ACROSS DIFFERENT DISCIPLINES AND EDUCATIONAL SECTORS (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL SEE FIT INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 SEYMOUR ROAD
LONDON
N8 0BJ
- Phone:
- 02083416488
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window