Accounts and annual returns THE SECCHI DISK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2022 15 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 28 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 19 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 26 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 10 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window