Financial history THE SECCHI DISK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022
Total gross income £3.52k £6.31k £2.40k £2.12k £7.07k
Total expenditure £11.73k £11.77k £8.50k £1.23k £2.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A