Financial history London Donating Network

Charity number: 1169262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £73.75k £15.66k £44.79k £18.75k £36.46k
Total expenditure £68.70k £19.08k £40.44k £22.06k £29.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A