Financial history ILFA

Charity number: 1170647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £168.42k £160.85k £248.28k £64.83k £65.53k
Total expenditure £182.26k £159.98k £222.39k £75.41k £42.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A