THE CORNERSTONES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 December 2019 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 December 2019 329 days late Download
Annual return 11 September 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2017 18 October 2018 99 days late Download