THE CORNERSTONES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Carey Trustee 08 May 2019
BLACKBURNE HOUSE Received: On time
THE ANTHONY WALKER FOUNDATION
REBECCA JANE ROSS-WILLIAMS Trustee 16 February 2018 None on record
James Shaw Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Steve Reddy Trustee 13 November 2017 None on record
MARCUS MAGEE Trustee 17 March 2017 None on record
Dr Anthony Lloyd Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
IAIN GOLDREIN QC Chair 26 October 2016 None on record
Peter Daniel Oliver Trustee 10 June 2021
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Jason Woodcock Trustee 10 June 2021 None on record