HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH PONTYPRIDD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has held regular public meetings on a Sunday where we have met together to worship God, preach from the Bible and have fellowship together. Involved with New Wine Cymru's 'Mission Wales' week where teams of Christians walked town centres offering prayer to people and advancing the Gospel. Hosts a free Youth Club in Rhydyfelin to reduce the impact of poverty on young people through Eden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 22 November 2016: CIO registration
- Hope Church Rhydyfelin (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ryan | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jason Ferreira | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Davies | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murray | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVIES | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.96k | £58.93k | £108.38k | £236.11k | £34.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.67k | £43.78k | £55.25k | £303.43k | £37.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.07k | £1.50k | £125.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN WALES AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WALES AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hope Rhydyfelin
Glyntaff Housing Estate
PONTYPRIDD
Mid Glamorgan
CF37 5ES
- Phone:
- 07948425478
- Email:
- enquires@hccp.uk
- Website:
-
hoperhydyfelin.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window