ISLINGTON SOMALI WELFARE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice Education Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALID YUSUF MOHAMED | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Usama Yusuf Mohamed | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahamoud Mahamed kolomey | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yusuf Omar | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £38.40k | £38.40k | £33.20k | £36.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £38.10k | £38.10k | £33.10k | £36.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2021 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2021 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM: 4.1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADULT EDUCATION CLUBS AND CLASSES (ESOL) INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF PRIVATE TUITION FOR THOSE IN NEED OF BASIC ENGLISH LESSONS. 4.2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING IN AREAS INCLUDING FORM-FILLING, TRANSLATION SERVICES, HOUSING AND EMPLOYMENT. 4.3. TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND/OR RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT BETWEEN ALL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
174 SEVEN SISTERS ROAD
LONDON
N7 7PX
- Phone:
- 07846869170
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window