LIVERPOOL MEDICAL STUDENTS' SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Liverpool Medical Students' Society is committed to the academic, welfare, social, extra-curricular, developmental and charitable giving needs of its Members. We are run by Medical Students for Medical Students and operate in Liverpool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 21 June 2016: Standard registration
- L.M.S.S. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR BRIAN DOMINIC O'CONNOR | Chair | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jake Henry Woodward | Trustee | 20 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kieran William Banner | Trustee | 20 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew James | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Haris Ali Sultan | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pooja Patel | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel Edward Brian Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Edward Arthur Hextall | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Michael Curtis | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Claire Doughty FRCS MD | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna May Griffin | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paige Hall MBChB | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Desmond O'Donnell | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Alistair Findlay | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Alice Waldon | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas James Greenhalgh | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Mary Lewis-Jones MBChB | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Patrick Kingsland OBE FRCGP | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.18k | £21.15k | £130.91k | £142.03k | £147.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.88k | £20.52k | £119.63k | £132.66k | £162.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2016 as amended on 03 Jul 2019 as amended on 17 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
3. CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES THE SOCIETY’S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STUDENTS IN MERSEYSIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1 THE PROTECTION, ADVANCEMENT, FURTHERANCE AND PROMOTION OF THE INTERESTS OF ITS MEMBERS AND ALUMNI ASSOCIATES AT ALL TIMES; 3.2 THE FURTHERING AND PROMOTION OF ACADEMIC EXCELLENCE AMONG ITS MEMBERS THROUGH THE HOLDING OF REGULAR TEACHING PROGRAMMES AND THE PROMOTION OF ACADEMIC EVENTS, REVISION LECTURES, AND OTHER SUCH SEMINARS, PRESENTATIONS AND TUTORIALS; 3.3 THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND ORGANISATION OF FUNDRAISING FOR LOCAL AND NATIONAL REGISTERED CHARITIES; 3.4 PROVIDING PASTORAL SUPPORT TO PROTECT, FURTHER, ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL WELLBEING AND WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AT ALL TIMES; 3.5 THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SOCIAL INTEGRATION AND CAMARADERIE AMONG ITS MEMBERS IN THE ORGANISATION OF A RANGE OF CURRICULAR AND EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS OF A SOCIAL, SPORTING, ACADEMIC, VOCATIONAL, CULTURAL, CHARITABLE AND PROFESSIONAL NATURE; 3.6 THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS AT WHICH THE MORAL, INTELLECTUAL, VOCATIONAL, TECHNICAL AND ARTISTIC INTERESTS OF ITS MEMBERS ARE ENCOURAGED; 3.7 THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND ORGANISATION OF SPORTING ACTIVITIES AMONG ITS MEMBERS; 6 VERSION 1.1 13/06/2016 3.8 THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION REGARDING THE SOCIETY AND ITS MEMBERS THROUGH THE PUBLICATION OF AN OFFICIAL SOCIETY JOURNAL, NAMELY ‘SPHINCTER’, AND THROUGH THE USE OF AN OFFICIAL SOCIETY INTERNET WEBSITE, AND APPROPRIATE SOCIAL MEDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LMSS Office
School of Medicine
University Of Liverpool
Cedar House
Ashton Street
Liverpoo
- Phone:
- 0151 795 4362
- Email:
- president@lmssonline.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window