Financial history ST MATTHEWS BIG LOCAL (LEICESTER)

Charity number: 1166668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £119.22k £448.38k £220.32k £233.65k £196.91k
Total expenditure £98.64k £105.25k £160.06k £169.84k £204.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.49k £101.55k £2.00k £28.84k £4.89k