Trustees ST MATTHEWS BIG LOCAL (LEICESTER)
Charity number: 1166668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEE NICHOLLS | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Saima Shah | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zakaria Ahmed | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Whitmore | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ali Adnan | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amina Gharda | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aysha Karolia | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SR CHRIS JAMES CSF | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|||||
CAROL ALLAN | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.