Financial history CROSSLANDS

Charity number: 1167211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £0 £172.92k £304.73k £386.06k £461.18k
Total expenditure £0 £141.60k £311.10k £296.91k £314.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A