Accounts and annual returns BEIS HATALMUD TRUST

Charity number: 1168216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 05 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 05 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window