Accounts and annual returns CANOLFAN DEULUOL TREGARON

Charity number: 1168620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window