THE WELSH SCHOOLS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1167479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 July 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 July 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download