DARLINGTON ASSISTANCE FOR REFUGEES

Charity number: 1170986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ivana Cigna Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Tresor Bukasa Trustee 07 March 2018 None on record
Andrew Newens Trustee 14 August 2019 None on record
Sally Forth Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
FRANCESCA WOOD Chair 28 April 2016 None on record
Janet Walker Trustee 14 August 2019 None on record
Christopher Taylor Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record