THE LIGHTHOUSE FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A CHURCH SERVING THE LYTCHETT MATRAVERS AREA, WITH SERVICES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP FOR ALL AGES AND CLUBS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUTH. PARENTING AND MARRIAGE COURSES ARE OFFERED AND HELP IS GIVEN TO NEEDY PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL AND SURROUNDING AREAS. WORK WITH CHURCHES IN JAPAN IS SUPPORTED ON A REGULAR BASIS, AS IS WORK AMONGST PEOPLE IN UGANDA. OVERSEAS RELIEF NEEDS ARE SUPPORTED AS AND WHEN REQUIRED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Japan
- Philippines
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 July 2016: CIO registration
- 01 November 2018: Funds received from 1071370 THE LIGHTHOUSE (LYTCHETT MATRAVERS) TRUST
- THE LIGHTHOUSE (LYTCHETT MATRAVERS) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Burton | Chair | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Bessant | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Weir | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Paul Harden | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP EDWARD READ | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN LAWRENCE BURTON | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £412.51k | £226.23k | £546.54k | £208.38k | £257.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.67k | £264.31k | £308.32k | £197.55k | £179.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £519.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £4.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £22.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £278.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £228.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £80.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN DORSET AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT D22
ADMIRALTY PARK
STATION ROAD
HOLTON HEATH
POOLE
BH16 6HX
- Phone:
- 01202628965
- Email:
- admin@thelighthouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window