Accounts and annual returns ST GEORGES YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507873
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window