Financial history ST GEORGES YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507873
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £34.23k £34.23k £53.85k £60.90k £65.85k
Total expenditure £39.99k £39.99k £39.16k £39.16k £60.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £18.50k £28.50k £38.85k £18.50k