Teardrops Supporting Your Community

Charity number: 1169427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2018 On time Download