THE JAZZ CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1167421
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 20 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)