Accounts and annual returns COLYTON PARISH HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1167230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required