PEBBLES LEGACY

Charity number: 1168055
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download