HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY NORTH WEST KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance and promote the religion, spiritual and cultural interests of the followers of the Hindu faith by providing a place of worship of the Hindu faith by persons professing the Hindu religion and where may be celebrated the principal Hindu festivals and the religious functions in accordance with the Hindu faith. Also organizing health and social promotion group activities for young and old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 26 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMMU BHAGWANDEEN | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LILITA PATTNI | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
VINOD KUMAR | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABNASH KUMER SAREEN | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DHARAMVIR SOLANKI | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIBHA KATARI | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £14.08k | £21.98k | £22.80k | £25.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.96k | £4.01k | £3.05k | £4.48k | £12.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 May 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBIC IN THE NORTH WEST KENT AREA IN THE TRADITIONS OF THE HINDU RELIGION, INCLUDING YOGA, THE HINDU LANGUAGE AND HINDU FESTIVALS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A HINDU CULTURAL CENTRE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION WITHIN NORTH WEST KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT AND OPERATION OF A HINDU TEMPLE. (3) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES WITHIN THE NORTH WEST KENT AREA FOR RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITHIN THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10-12 Manor Road
Gravesend
DA12 1AA
- Phone:
- 01474321703
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window