Accounts and annual returns HIGHBANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 May 2022 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 May 2022 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 May 2022 844 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 July 2019 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required