Financial history HIGHBANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.41k £15.89k £11.71k £3.94k £3.46k
Total expenditure £17.42k £14.60k £9.27k £7.09k £4.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.84k £4.36k £4.14k N/A N/A