KICKSTART KIBERA

Charity number: 1169827
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 March 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)