Financial history Mosaic LGBT+ Young Persons' Trust

Charity number: 1166676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.10k £55.06k £125.76k £118.63k £141.37k
Total expenditure £9.32k £34.00k £62.30k £112.75k £111.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £1 N/A £2.95k £14.00k
Income from government grants £0 £15.65k N/A N/A N/A