UNDER THE CLOCK BRADFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to maintain a museum of policing, crime and punishment, the criminal justice system and civil enforcement in Bradford from the early 19th century to the present day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £15,228 from 5000 government contract(s) and £15,228 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 12 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WATSON READ OBE | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR MARTIN RICHARD BAINES | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR CLEGG | Trustee | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.09k | £2.07k | £14.85k | £34.04k | £32.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £6.85k | £15.91k | £15.60k | £36.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.23k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.55k | £23.34k | £15.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUN 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM OF POLICING, CRIME AND PUNISHMENT, THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM AND CIVIL ENFORCEMENT IN BRADFORD FROM THE EARLY 19TH CENTURY TO THE PRESENT DAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITY OF BRADFORD
CITY HALL
CENTENARY SQUARE
BRADFORD
BD1 1HY
- Phone:
- 01274510245
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window