Trustees CHARITY GLOBAL (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1169228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Helen Manktelow Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Eniola Aluko Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Mara Patricia Klemich Trustee 26 February 2020
None on record
SAMUEL MICHAEL LAWSON JOHNSTON Trustee 17 October 2016
ST JOHN'S HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
LUKE BEAUCHAMP Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
Onyeije Nwokorie Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
VALERIE DONATI Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record
SCOTT HARRISON Trustee 15 September 2016
None on record