Financial history MISSIONS OF HOPE

Charity number: 1168490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.99k £16.04k £10.38k £4.30k £0
Total expenditure £1.34k £16.56k £8.59k £3.40k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A