Accounts and annual returns HECTOR'S GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity number: 1168327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required