Financial history HECTOR'S GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity number: 1168327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.06k £126.63k £72.16k £102.69k £138.81k
Total expenditure £17.17k £45.09k £86.88k £103.52k £127.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A