Trustees HECTOR'S GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity number: 1168327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HAYLEY JANINE DONATA BRADLEY Chair 19 April 2015
None on record
Victoria Anne Johnson Trustee 23 July 2021
None on record
Martin Simmons Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Alison Jones Trustee 05 April 2020
None on record
Fred Brown Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record