Accounts and annual returns THE ARCHIE LLOYD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 08 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window