THE HOLY TRINITY & ST SILAS PRIMARY SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to advance the education of pupils of Holy Trinity & St Silas Primary School in particular by engaging in activities or providing facilities, grants or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
Governance
- 24 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Michael Stokes Butler | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Xenitellis | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Anne Roden | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE DOLAN | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £7.92k | £10.83k | £10.62k | £11.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.23k | £966 | £193 | £7.13k | £13.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 May 2016 as amended on 09 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF HOLY TRINITY & ST SILAS PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES, GRANTS OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY PRIMARY SCHOOL
HARTLAND ROAD
LONDON
NW1 8DE
- Phone:
- 020 7267 0771
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window