Accounts and annual returns BROMLEY TEMPLE TRUST

Charity number: 1166773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 October 2020 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2020 25 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2018 24 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2018 24 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window