CARE2SHARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care2Share seeks to empower individuals and communities in developing nations, sharing Christ's transforming power in the areas of Education, Life Skills Training, Basic Healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 22 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NIGEL ADAMS | Chair | 18 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Scarlett Elizabeth Tice | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Hunter | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SCOTT FREARSON HUNTER | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANNY JOHN | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.92k | £17.13k | £14.97k | £23.76k | £16.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63k | £21.11k | £16.67k | £12.63k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SPREADING THE GOSPEL IN AREAS OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD THROUGH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION CLASSES IN IT, TAILORING AND LITERACY. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE SETTING UP OF BASIC PRIMARY HEALTH CARE UNITS IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 0203 9584406
- Email:
- info@care2share.org.uk
- Website:
-
care2share.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window