PARENT AND CHILD TOGETHER NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent and Child North East is a supported housing Charitable Incorporated Organisation based in Darlington. The organisation provides a high standard of accommodation, support, training and therapeutic services to vulnerable families. The CIO is supported by volunteers who provide befriending for families, and maintain the accommodation and grounds at Eagle House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 October 2016: CIO registration
- PACTNE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR BIRTLE | Chair | 04 October 2016 |
|
|||||
lisa jayne carlin | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Miles Leighton | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Elliott | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elliott | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANE GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.14k | £209.36k | £196.59k | £235.35k | £271.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.33k | £129.11k | £207.84k | £221.14k | £225.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PARENTS AND CHILDREN LIVING IN THE TEES VALLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPORTED ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT, ADVICE, TRAINING AND THERAPEUTIC SERVICES TO YOUNG PERSONS AND ADULTS WHO ARE PREGNANT OR PARENTING CHILDREN AND WHO ARE MADE VULNERABLE BY HOMELESSNESS, NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eagle House
Hurworth Moor
Darlington
DL2 1QE
- Phone:
- 07535977188
- Email:
- office@pactne.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window