MICRO RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of: - social inclusion amongst LGBTI people by preventing them from becoming socially excluded and relieving the needs of those who are - equality and diversity by the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation, gender identity or intersex status; and advancing education and raising awareness in equality and diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Brazil
- Cambodia
Governance
- 24 October 2016: CIO registration
- MRIF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR S ROCCA | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
OLUWASSUN BLESSING BRAIMAH | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MS L CASONATO | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATIENCE ONAGHINO | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCO DE MATTEIS | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.76k | £120.19k | £283.13k | £274.68k | £248.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.49k | £109.29k | £175.92k | £132.43k | £188.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER IDENTITY OR INTERSEX STATUS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; AND C) CONDUCTING AND COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND INTERSEX (LGBTI) PEOPLE AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC. 2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST LGBTI PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING LGBTI PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, DUE TO SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER IDENTITY OR INTERSEX STATUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRI Foundation
5 Brayford Square
London
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 07704170553
- Email:
- info@mrifoundation.global
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window