WELCOME GROUP HALESOWEN

Charity number: 1168507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN PATRICIA BRYAN Trustee 05 September 2009 None on record
Rachel Hall Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
DILYS MARGARET WARD Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record
Lynn Gower Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH LACON Trustee 07 January 2009
BLACKHEATH AND HALESOWEN METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Anne Gardner Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
ANDREW RICHARD HARWOOD Chair 15 March 2018 None on record
Clare Neville Trustee 24 January 2019 None on record
Freda Parkes Trustee 21 April 2014 None on record
Mike Gower Mr Trustee 27 May 2020 None on record
Moira McNulty Trustee 20 July 2017 None on record
Dr MATTHEW JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 11 February 2015 None on record