Accounts and annual returns INDIAN MUSIC HUB

Charity number: 1167848
Charity reporting is overdue by 657 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 292 days
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 292 days
Annual return 21 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 657 days
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 657 days
Annual return 21 April 2020 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2020 18 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 April 2019 09 June 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2019 09 June 2020 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 April 2018 20 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 April 2018 23 August 2019 183 days late Download Open in new window