Accounts and annual returns A STAGE FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1167083
Charity reporting is overdue by 1788 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Annual return 09 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Annual return 09 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1057 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1057 days
Annual return 09 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1423 days
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1423 days
Annual return 09 May 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1788 days