Financial history HEXTABLE COMMUNITY COLLECTIVE T/A THE HOWARD VENUE

Charity number: 1167877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £92.49k £96.45k £104.23k £138.88k £114.61k
Total expenditure £73.71k £93.35k £88.79k £96.22k £85.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £2.00k £4.00k N/A
Income from government grants £892 N/A N/A £25.00k £44.43k