GREATER MANCHESTER WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 508002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Louise Forrest Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record
Matt Dawson Trustee 26 September 2018 None on record
IRIS EMERY Trustee None on record
Laura Katherine Pridding Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
David Copeland Trustee 16 September 2014 None on record
Roger Kettle Trustee 27 July 2014 None on record
Andrew Farrell Trustee 01 December 2014
CONTACT Received: 3 days late
CHRISTINE WINTERBOTTOM Trustee 24 September 2019
URMSTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: 4 days late
5TH URMSTON (AQUILIFER) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Lucy Nattrass Trustee 24 September 2019
WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HALE Received: On time
Lewis Foster Trustee 12 November 2015 None on record